TN SB0471 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the manner in which the names of candidates for the United States Senate are placed on the ballot for the November general election; requires the persons to be nominated in an open meeting as a candidate for the majority party by legislative members of the majority party and as a candidate for the minority party by legislative members of the minority party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, revises the manner in which the names of candidates for the United States Senate are placed on the ballot for the November general election; requires the persons to be nominated in an open meeting as a candidate for the majority party by legislative members of the majority party and as a candidate for the minority party by legislative members of the minority party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. Reset on last cal. of 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | S. Reset on 1st cal. of March 2014 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | S. Reset on cal. for final cal. of 2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0415 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee