TN HB0415 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the manner in which the names of candidates for the United States Senate are placed on the ballot for the November general election; requires the persons to be nominated in an open meeting as a candidate for the majority party by legislative members of the majority party and as a candidate for the minority party by legislative members of the minority party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, revises the manner in which the names of candidates for the United States Senate are placed on the ballot for the November general election; requires the persons to be nominated in an open meeting as a candidate for the majority party by legislative members of the majority party and as a candidate for the minority party by legislative members of the minority party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0471 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.