TN SB0458 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 329
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 329
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the authority to enter into cooperative purchasing agreements with local governmental entities outside Tennessee to other local governments, rather than municipalities only; revises other various provisions regarding purchasing by local governmental units; revises provisions regarding reverse auctions. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Section 12-4-126.
Title
As enacted, expands the authority to enter into cooperative purchasing agreements with local governmental entities outside Tennessee to other local governments, rather than municipalities only; revises other various provisions regarding purchasing by local governmental units; revises provisions regarding reverse auctions. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Section 12-4-126.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 329 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0300) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Comp. HB subst. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0739 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 329