TN SB0457 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts certain sales of gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts certain sales of gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0992 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020