TN SB0455 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the University of Tennessee and East Tennessee State University to annually submit a report to the education and health committees of the general assembly that includes the number of students who graduated from the respective institution in the previous year to become practitioners in the fields of primary care medicine or family practice medicine. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to medical education.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0518 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.