TN SB0440 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, improves retirement benefits of certain Tennessee public employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36.
Title
As introduced, improves retirement benefits of certain Tennessee public employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0470 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee