TN SB0438 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to disclose the identity of the person reporting suspected abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult to law enforcement and the district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to elderly and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0629 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee