TN SB0431 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an individual licensed in another state to practice medicine to practice telehealth in this state if the patient cannot otherwise receive the services the healthcare provider will provide within this state and the healthcare provider files a limited waiver request with the appropriate licensing board that certifies that the patient needs such services and that other options for the services are unavailable in this state. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56 and Title 63, relative to telehealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0469 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee