TN SB0427 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the recommendations submitted by a regional historic zoning commission to a county or municipal legislative body regarding the creation of a historic district or zone identify the statutory criteria or criterion met by the proposed historic zone or district. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to land use regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0476 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.