TN SB0419 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 481
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 481
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises educational requirements for office of constable. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises educational requirements for office of constable. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 481 | |
2011-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0548) | |
2011-05-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0530 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 481