TN SB0417 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that the governor receive authorization by the general assembly prior to making any decision or obligating the state with regard to the expansion of optional enrollment in the medical assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to medical assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0736 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee