TN SB0415 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain insurers that provide major medical insurance coverage to make available on an optional basis as part of or as an endorsement to each policy that is issued, delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this state on or after January 1, 2020, coverage for stem cell therapy. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires certain insurers that provide major medical insurance coverage to make available on an optional basis as part of or as an endorsement to each policy that is issued, delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this state on or after January 1, 2020, coverage for stem cell therapy. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1208 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee