TN HB1208 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires certain insurers that provide major medical insurance coverage to make available on an optional basis as part of or as an endorsement to each policy that is issued, delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this state on or after January 1, 2020, coverage for stem cell therapy. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires certain insurers that provide major medical insurance coverage to make available on an optional basis as part of or as an endorsement to each policy that is issued, delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this state on or after January 1, 2020, coverage for stem cell therapy. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0415 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback