TN SB0407 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires persons working with certain electrical equipment to meet certain requirements; makes that electrical equipment subject to inspection by a state-certified electrical inspector; prohibits liability against certain electric systems arising from those persons working with that electrical equipment; requires that copies of the national standards be available for public viewing. - Amends TCA Section 68-101-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 68-101-104, relative to electrical safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0252 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021