TN HB0252 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires persons working with certain electrical equipment to meet certain requirements; makes that electrical equipment subject to inspection by a state-certified electrical inspector; prohibits liability against certain electric systems arising from those persons working with that electrical equipment; requires that copies of the national standards be available for public viewing. - Amends TCA Section 68-101-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 68-101-104, relative to electrical safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 177 | |
2021-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/21 |
2021-03-08 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0407 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177