TN SB0403 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 540
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 540
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the joint select committee to study business taxes from June 30, 2009, until June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 15, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, extends the joint select committee to study business taxes from June 30, 2009, until June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 15, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 540 | |
2009-06-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (4) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (4) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-06-02 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0529 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 540