TN SB0400 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Sergeant Daniel Baker Act," which removes the appeal to the court of criminal appeals in death penalty cases; provides for automatic direct review by the Tennessee supreme court for convictions for which a sentence of death is imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Sergeant Daniel Baker Act," which removes the appeal to the court of criminal appeals in death penalty cases; provides for automatic direct review by the Tennessee supreme court for convictions for which a sentence of death is imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-14SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-07SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-03-04SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/19/2019
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0258 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback