TN HB0258 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Sergeant Daniel Baker Act," which removes the appeal to the court of criminal appeals in death penalty cases; provides for automatic direct review by the Tennessee supreme court for convictions for which a sentence of death is imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Sergeant Daniel Baker Act," which removes the appeal to the court of criminal appeals in death penalty cases; provides for automatic direct review by the Tennessee supreme court for convictions for which a sentence of death is imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 6
2019-03-21SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0068)
2019-03-21SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0073)
2019-03-21SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 2 - SA0069)
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 0, Nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-21SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 73, Nays 22, PNV 2
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0400 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback