TN SB0400 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a pilot program to provide grants to elementary and middle schools to implement the Leader in Me® pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, creates a pilot program to provide grants to elementary and middle schools to implement the Leader in Me® pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0288 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee