TN SB0394 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises requirements in state law where an SAT score is explicitly stated to account for the change in scoring on the revised SAT exams. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-702 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, revises requirements in state law where an SAT score is explicitly stated to account for the change in scoring on the revised SAT exams. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-702 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 328 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/09/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0444 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328