TN SB0393 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers rulemaking authority under the Jacob Nunley Act and under the provisions governing the Hepatitis B waiver form at institutions of higher education from THEC to the governing boards of each public institution of higher learning; requires the governing board of each public institution of higher learning, in consultation with the department of health, to promulgate rules regarding immunization requirements for students enrolled within each respective institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, transfers rulemaking authority under the Jacob Nunley Act and under the provisions governing the Hepatitis B waiver form at institutions of higher education from THEC to the governing boards of each public institution of higher learning; requires the governing board of each public institution of higher learning, in consultation with the department of health, to promulgate rules regarding immunization requirements for students enrolled within each respective institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 166 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2017 | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0079) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0079) |
2017-04-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0064) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1002 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 166