TN SB0392 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board of medical examiners to consider including a course in maternal mental health when establishing continuing medical educational requirements for persons licensed to practice medicine. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, relative to maternal mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Charlane Oliver [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 16, Nays 7, PNV 6 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0054) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0036) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/16/2023 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/8/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0575 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee