TN SB0376 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Veterans' Bill of Rights." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to veterans' rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-28SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/7/2023
2023-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2023
2023-01-26SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0446 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback