TN HB0446 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Veterans' Bill of Rights." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to veterans' rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0376 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee