TN SB0367 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY TRAVIS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION AMENDMENT # 3 BY TRAVIS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 11 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY FITZHUGH PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateVetoed by Governor.
2018-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-16HousePassed H., Ayes 82, Nays 13, PNV 0
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0187)
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1152)
2018-04-16HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0988)
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA1214)
2018-04-16HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA1216)
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0987)
2018-04-16HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1
2018-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0555)
2018-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0192)
2018-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
2018-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-20SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-02-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/20/2018
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/6/2018
2018-01-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/6/2018
2018-01-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/23/2018
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to first calendar of 2018
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-02-08SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0523 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback