TN HB0523 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-16HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-16HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2018-04-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-20HouseAction def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/27/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13HouseAction def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-07HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/13/2018
2018-02-06HouseAction def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2/13/2018
2018-01-31HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/6/2018
2017-04-11HouseAction def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2018
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseAction def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-07HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0367 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-03 - Vetoed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0523&ga=110
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB0523.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0187.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0987.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0988.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1152.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1214.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1216.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM0927.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/SB0367.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1714.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2918.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM3137.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0523&ga=110

Bill Comments

feedback