TN SB0365 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee River resort district boundary from three miles of the nearest bank of the Tennessee River to seven miles of the nearest bank of the Tennessee River. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, extends the Tennessee River resort district boundary from three miles of the nearest bank of the Tennessee River to seven miles of the nearest bank of the Tennessee River. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0283 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0365&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0365.pdf |