TN SB0357 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of agriculture to submit a plan to the federal government for Tennessee to have primary regulatory authority over hemp production in this state as authorized by the federal Agricultural Improvement Act of 2018; establishes an administrative framework for the plan. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6, Part 1; Section 47-26-101; Title 53; Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of agriculture to submit a plan to the federal government for Tennessee to have primary regulatory authority over hemp production in this state as authorized by the federal Agricultural Improvement Act of 2018; establishes an administrative framework for the plan. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6, Part 1; Section 47-26-101; Title 53; Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-07SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-03-07SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0023)
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-03-04SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0844 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback