TN HB0844 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises and enacts various provisions regarding hemp, including licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6, Part 1; Section 47-26-101; Title 53; Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.
Title
As enacted, revises and enacts various provisions regarding hemp, including licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6, Part 1; Section 47-26-101; Title 53; Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 87 | |
2019-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0357 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 87