TN SB0356 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits denying a law enforcement officer entry to or removing a law enforcement officer from an event for which the officer holds a valid ticket or has paid an admission fee if denial or removal is based on the officer’s lawful carrying of a firearm; permits owner or operator of venue for an event to require law enforcement officer to inform the owner or operator that the officer will be present at the event and in possession of a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits denying a law enforcement officer entry to or removing a law enforcement officer from an event for which the officer holds a valid ticket or has paid an admission fee if denial or removal is based on the officer’s lawful carrying of a firearm; permits owner or operator of venue for an event to require law enforcement officer to inform the owner or operator that the officer will be present at the event and in possession of a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0455 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee