TN SB0354 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/14/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/14/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Caitlyn Kaufman Interstate Safety Act," which expands the authorized uses of surveillance cameras on interstate highways. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, relative to the use of surveillance cameras on interstate highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/14/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 450 | |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0360) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0221) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 54, Nays 32, PNV 4 |
2021-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0360) |
2021-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0221) |
2021-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0179) |
2021-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0189) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0476 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450