TN SB0354 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Full Throttle Distillery located in Trimble a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates the Full Throttle Distillery located in Trimble a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0411 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-08 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee