TN SB0344 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1300 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee