TN SB0338 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau to conduct an annual review of all medications and forms of treatment for lupus, and services for enrollees with a diagnosis of lupus that are eligible for coverage under the medical assistance program; requires the bureau to solicit and consider input from the public when conducting the annual review; requires an annual report to be made to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0362 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee