TN SB0335 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends board of social work licensure, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 23.
Title
As enacted, extends board of social work licensure, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 23.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Pub. Ch. 504 | |
2009-07-07 | Effective date(s) 06/25/09 | |
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-15 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-15 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-10 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-09 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-04 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/9/09 | |
2009-06-04 | Reset on message cal. for 6/9/09 | |
2009-06-03 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/4/09 | |
2009-06-02 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/2/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/28/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | H. Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, Kernell, Casada) | |
2009-05-04 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/7/09 | |
2009-04-30 | S. Conf. comm. appointed. (Johnson, Watson, Ford) | |
2009-04-30 | S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence. | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 04/30/2009 | |
2009-04-27 | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 | |
2009-04-23 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/09 | |
2009-04-20 | S. refused to concur in am. 1 | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0173) | |
2009-04-16 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-03-04 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-02 | Passed S, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/02/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on Sen. Government Op. Consent cal. for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0996 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-04 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.