TN SB0333 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of platinum, gold, or silver bullion, the sale of numismatic coins that are sold for less than $10,000, and the sale of numismatic coins at a national, statewide, or multi-county trade show. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of platinum, gold, or silver bullion, the sale of numismatic coins that are sold for less than $10,000, and the sale of numismatic coins at a national, statewide, or multi-county trade show. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0212 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0333&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB0333.pdf |