TN HB0212 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of platinum, gold, or silver bullion, the sale of numismatic coins that are sold for less than $10,000, and the sale of numismatic coins at a national, statewide, or multi-county trade show. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of platinum, gold, or silver bullion, the sale of numismatic coins that are sold for less than $10,000, and the sale of numismatic coins at a national, statewide, or multi-county trade show. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseWithdrawn.
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0333 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback