TN SB0327 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain disclosures by members of the general assembly regarding travel expenses paid on behalf of the member. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 1; Title 3, Chapter 6 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, requires certain disclosures by members of the general assembly regarding travel expenses paid on behalf of the member. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 1; Title 3, Chapter 6 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470 | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0275 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 470