TN SB0320 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands Hope Scholarship eligibility to include Tennessee residents who graduate from accredited boarding schools that are not located in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, expands Hope Scholarship eligibility to include Tennessee residents who graduate from accredited boarding schools that are not located in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0316 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-04 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0320&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0320.pdf |