TN SB0316 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Concurred on HA#1, Ayes 31, Nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Concurred on HA#1, Ayes 31, Nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, restricts the types of costs of a project within a certified border region retail tourism development district or regional retail tourism development district that can be covered by an apportionment of state sales and use taxes to a municipality or industrial development corporation; makes other revisions to the Border Region Tourism Development District Act and the Regional Retail Tourism Development District Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40 and Title 7, Chapter 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 40 and Title 7, Chapter 41, relative to the development of retail and other public tourism facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Concurred on HA#1, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, & Means Committee for 4/23/24 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Finance, Ways, & Means Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0988) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0235) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with recommendation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0776 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.