TN SB0309 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires mandatory minimum sentences for certain criminal convictions involving semi-automatic firearms. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, requires mandatory minimum sentences for certain criminal convictions involving semi-automatic firearms. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0047 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee