TN SB0305 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Gaylord Springs Golf Links to seek a caterer license and to grant a franchise for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; designates the Wildhorse Saloon as a restaurant for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; authorizes the General Jackson Showboat to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises of its principal dock. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 4, relative to premises on which sales and consumption of alcoholic beverages is authorized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 320 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0339 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021