TN SB0305 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Envr. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Envr. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, transfers jurisdiction of Off-Highway Vehicle Act from wildlife resources agency to department of environment and conservation. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 68 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, transfers jurisdiction of Off-Highway Vehicle Act from wildlife resources agency to department of environment and conservation. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 68 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of Envr. Com. | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0495 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0305&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0305.pdf |