TN SB0304 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, recreates the elder abuse task force, which was terminated and dissolved January 15, 2021; extends date for the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the governor and general assembly to January 15, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to adult protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 464 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0345 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464