TN HB0345 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, recreates the elder abuse task force, which was terminated and dissolved January 15, 2021; extends date for the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the governor and general assembly to January 15, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to adult protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for reveiw |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0304 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021