TN SB0304 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 207
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 207
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a privately owned for-profit community public water system to have access to the drinking water revolving loan fund. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As enacted, allows a privately owned for-profit community public water system to have access to the drinking water revolving loan fund. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 207 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2015 | |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0161 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 207