TN SB0297 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 380 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2017 | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0387) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0387) |
2017-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0280) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0362) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0666 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380