TN SB0287 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of financial institutions to prepare and submit annually, instead of biennally, an analysis and recapitulation of certain information on title pledge lenders. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of financial institutions to prepare and submit annually, instead of biennally, an analysis and recapitulation of certain information on title pledge lenders. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0398 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0287&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0287.pdf |