TN SB0278 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits an individual's property that does not meet the minimum size requirements for greenbelt classification to be aggregated with contiguous property owned by others who are related to the individual by blood, marriage, or adoption for the purpose of meeting the minimum size requirements. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, permits an individual's property that does not meet the minimum size requirements for greenbelt classification to be aggregated with contiguous property owned by others who are related to the individual by blood, marriage, or adoption for the purpose of meeting the minimum size requirements. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0096 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Local Government of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0278&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0278.pdf |