TN SB0275 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the governor to strive to appoint at least one person to the board of parole who has experience in corrections, probation, or parole; declares the governor the appointing authority for all board members. - Amends TCA Section 40-28-103.
Title
As enacted, requires the governor to strive to appoint at least one person to the board of parole who has experience in corrections, probation, or parole; declares the governor the appointing authority for all board members. - Amends TCA Section 40-28-103.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 108 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2017 | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 19, PNV 4 |
2017-03-20 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0028) |
2017-03-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0015) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/16/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0398 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108